NY A09715 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates from the class A misdemeanor of theft of services, the avoidance of payment for railroad, subway, bus or other public transportation services and allows for community service in lieu of a civil penalty for certain offenders of theft of transit services.
Title
Eliminates from the class A misdemeanor of theft of services, the avoidance of payment for railroad, subway, bus or other public transportation services and allows for community service in lieu of a civil penalty for certain offenders of theft of transit services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | print number 9715a |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04841 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4841C