NY S04839 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.682
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.682
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture or sale of cosmetics tested on animals; punishable by a fine of not more than five thousand dollars for the first violation and not more than one thousand dollars per day if the violation continues; the attorney general may investigate and bring an action for violations.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture or sale of cosmetics tested on animals; punishable by a fine of not more than five thousand dollars for the first violation and not more than one thousand dollars per day if the violation continues; the attorney general may investigate and bring an action for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.682 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.499 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a5653b |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.626 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4839B |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4839A |
2021-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05653 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - substituted by s4839b