NY A05653 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - substituted by s4839b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the manufacture or sale of cosmetics tested on animals; punishable by a fine of not more than five thousand dollars for the first violation and not more than one thousand dollars per day if the violation continues; the attorney general may investigate and bring an action for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the manufacture or sale of cosmetics tested on animals; punishable by a fine of not more than five thousand dollars for the first violation and not more than one thousand dollars per day if the violation continues; the attorney general may investigate and bring an action for violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-25Assemblysubstituted by s4839b
2022-03-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.499
2022-03-22Assemblyreported
2022-02-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2022-02-10Assemblyprint number 5653b
2022-02-10Assemblyamend and recommit to economic development
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to economic development
2021-04-21Assemblyprint number 5653a
2021-04-21Assemblyamend and recommit to economic development
2021-02-22Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S04839 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A5653
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05653&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05653
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05653&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05653A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05653&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05653B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05653&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05653&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback