NY S04825 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4825A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4825A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires telephone companies to disclose information to subscribers regarding the backup power solution for their voice service equipment.
Title
Requires telephone companies to disclose information to subscribers regarding the backup power solution for their voice service equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4825A |
2022-03-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00338 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS