NY S04817 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.312
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.312
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Lewis in Lewis County to be a nonresident of the town of Lewis.
Title
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Lewis in Lewis County to be a nonresident of the town of Lewis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.312 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.556 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7273a |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 4817B |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1239 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4817A |
2015-04-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07273 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4817b