NY S04815 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4815A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4815A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an enterprise approach to the detection and prevention of fraud, waste and abuse in state government and the detection and prevention of improper payments of public moneys.
Title
Authorizes an enterprise approach to the detection and prevention of fraud, waste and abuse in state government and the detection and prevention of improper payments of public moneys.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4815A |
2014-05-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06988 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - reported referred to codes