NY A06988 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an enterprise approach to the detection and prevention of fraud, waste and abuse in state government and the detection and prevention of improper payments of public moneys.
Title
Authorizes an enterprise approach to the detection and prevention of fraud, waste and abuse in state government and the detection and prevention of improper payments of public moneys.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | print number 6988a |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04815 (Same As) 2014-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4815A