NY S04807 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - SIGNED CHAP.555
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - SIGNED CHAP.555
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists to provide immunizations which are recommended by centers for disease control and prevention to patients eighteen years or older.
Title
Authorizes pharmacists to provide immunizations which are recommended by centers for disease control and prevention to patients eighteen years or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.555 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.210 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a6476a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 4807A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1136 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06476 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s4807a