NY S04744 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the county of Hamilton to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by mortgages on real property.
Title
Relates to authorizing the county of Hamilton to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by mortgages on real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1198 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06073 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means