NY S04742 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 4742B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 4742B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides workers' compensation benefits for injury or sickness, pregnancy or family leave; applies to an employee and to family members taking family leave to care for an employee.
Title
Provides workers' compensation benefits for injury or sickness, pregnancy or family leave; applies to an employee and to family members taking family leave to care for an employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4742B |
2014-03-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2014-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4742A |
2014-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2013-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01793 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR