NY S04732 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.311
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.311
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain establishments to display a poster with information regarding the national human trafficking resource center hotline.
Title
Requires certain establishments to display a poster with information regarding the national human trafficking resource center hotline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.311 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.41 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a4967a |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4732A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-01 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.666 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1044 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A04967 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s4732a