NY S04726 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that impersonation of a disabled veteran vendor, by carrying or possessing a specialized vending license without authority or any form of insignia or by words or actions; designates such impersonation as a class A misdemeanor.
Title
Provides that impersonation of a disabled veteran vendor, by carrying or possessing a specialized vending license without authority or any form of insignia or by words or actions; designates such impersonation as a class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.965 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-12 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1158 |
2011-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01125 (Same As) 2011-07-11 - enacting clause stricken
A10550 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - referred to codes
A10550 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - referred to codes