NY S04720 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to synthetic cannabinoids, synthetic cannabinoid analog and substituted cathinones and prohibits the production and sale thereof.
Title
Relates to synthetic cannabinoids, synthetic cannabinoid analog and substituted cathinones and prohibits the production and sale thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05454 (Same As) 2015-12-18 - enacting clause stricken
A08697 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - referred to health
A08697 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - referred to health