NY S04664 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to military ballots and elections for school boards of education and school budgets.
Title
Relates to military ballots and elections for school boards of education and school budgets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.646 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06726 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to election law