NY S04641 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes factors and requirements to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of an applicant's treating health care practitioner's opinion as to an applicant's disability.
Title
Establishes factors and requirements to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of an applicant's treating health care practitioner's opinion as to an applicant's disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.179 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.115 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | substituted for a4236 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.440 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A04236 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.179