NY S04635 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a residential lead remediation tax credit for the costs of abatement of lead contamination in a residence, when such removal is recommended by a certified specialist.
Title
Provides for a residential lead remediation tax credit for the costs of abatement of lead contamination in a residence, when such removal is recommended by a certified specialist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4635A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |