NY S04625 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contracts for transportation of children; requires that in New York city that the board of education or the city school district awards a contract or contracts for transportation pursuant to an evaluation of proposals submitted in response to a request for proposals, the board or city school district shall include employee protection provisions rationally relating to the promotion of a pool of qualified workers and the avoidance of labor disputes; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to contracts for transportation of children; requires that in New York city that the board of education or the city school district awards a contract or contracts for transportation pursuant to an evaluation of proposals submitted in response to a request for proposals, the board or city school district shall include employee protection provisions rationally relating to the promotion of a pool of qualified workers and the avoidance of labor disputes; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-06-22 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-22 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1081 | |
2010-06-15 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-02-09 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2009-05-19 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |