NY S04577 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.566
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.566
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes attorneys' fees to be awarded to any person that the court finds has acted to benefit the class.
Title
Authorizes attorneys' fees to be awarded to any person that the court finds has acted to benefit the class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.566 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.75 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a7519a |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4577A |
2011-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.441 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07519 (Same As) 2011-06-06 - substituted by s4577a