NY A07519 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - substituted by s4577a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - substituted by s4577a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes attorneys' fees to be awarded to any person that the court finds has acted to benefit the class.
Title
Authorizes attorneys' fees to be awarded to any person that the court finds has acted to benefit the class.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s4577a |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.75 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7519a |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04577 (Same As) 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.566