NY S04574 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6903A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6903A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a study by the commissioner of the office of children and family services regarding staffing levels with specific attention to staffing when incidents involving the misconduct of a resident occur.
Title
Creates a study by the commissioner of the office of children and family services regarding staffing levels with specific attention to staffing when incidents involving the misconduct of a resident occur.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6903A |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4574A |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06903 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - tabled