NY A06903 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a study by the commissioner of the office of children and family services regarding staffing levels with specific attention to staffing when incidents involving the misconduct of a resident occur.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a study by the commissioner of the office of children and family services regarding staffing levels with specific attention to staffing when incidents involving the misconduct of a resident occur.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-08Senate3RD READING CAL.477
2017-06-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4574A
2017-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.542
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-05-16Assemblyprint number 6903a
2017-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2017-03-24Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S04574 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6903A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06903&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06903&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06903
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06903&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06903A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06903&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06903&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6903#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback