NY S04543 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4543A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4543A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of fire insurance premium taxes; provides that a percentage of fire insurance premium taxes be paid to the treasurer of the NYS Professional Firefighters Association to promote, support and maintain the well-being of paid professional firefighters employed in the state.
Title
Relates to the distribution of fire insurance premium taxes; provides that a percentage of fire insurance premium taxes be paid to the treasurer of the NYS Professional Firefighters Association to promote, support and maintain the well-being of paid professional firefighters employed in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4543A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06260 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - print number 6260a