NY S04518 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts Howlett Hill Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Title
Exempts Howlett Hill Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.275 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.561 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4518 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-05-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.357 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-22 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6869 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.561 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06869 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.275