NY S04497 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6527A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6527A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to establishing the New York telecommunications relay service center.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to establishing the New York telecommunications relay service center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6527A |
2017-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.763 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4497A |
2017-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06527 (Same As) 2017-09-12 - signed chap.291