NY A06527 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to establishing the New York telecommunications relay service center.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to establishing the New York telecommunications relay service center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.291 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.763 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4497A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.350 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | print number 6527a |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04497 (Same As) 2017-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6527A