NY S04492 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of transportation to conduct a study pertaining to a proposed expansion of the Long Island Motor Parkway trail.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of transportation to conduct a study pertaining to a proposed expansion of the Long Island Motor Parkway trail.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.163 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.366 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a6413 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.443 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06413 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.163