NY S04491 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - SIGNED CHAP.456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants a personal income tax deduction for the amount of any student loan that is discharged as the result of the death or permanent and total disability of the borrower.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants a personal income tax deduction for the amount of any student loan that is discharged as the result of the death or permanent and total disability of the borrower.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.456
2017-12-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.224
2017-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a6601
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1272
2017-03-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-02-16SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06601 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - substituted by s4491

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback