NY S04491 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sales and deliveries of liquor and wine to not-for-profit organizations.
Title
Relates to sales and deliveries of liquor and wine to not-for-profit organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4491A |
2013-05-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02894 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS