NY S04488 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances the definition of dangerous contraband to include a gun, knife, cell phone or other wireless communication device, laptop computer, any device with global position capabilities, map, camera or explosive.
Title
Enhances the definition of dangerous contraband to include a gun, knife, cell phone or other wireless communication device, laptop computer, any device with global position capabilities, map, camera or explosive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.363 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.782 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |