NY S04488 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to signs on school buses; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations.
Title
Relates to signs on school buses; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.117 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.515 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4488A |
2011-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08174 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to transportation