NY S04407 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the making of decisions concerning guardianship, custody or visitation or adoption petitions solely on the basis of a parent's, guardian's or custodian's blindness; prohibits the department of social services from denying, deciding or opposing a petition or request for guardianship, custody or visitation solely because the petitioner is blind and prohibits the department of social services from taking actions solely because a parent, custodian or guardian is blind.
Title
Prohibits the making of decisions concerning guardianship, custody or visitation or adoption petitions solely on the basis of a parent's, guardian's or custodian's blindness; prohibits the department of social services from denying, deciding or opposing a petition or request for guardianship, custody or visitation solely because the petitioner is blind and prohibits the department of social services from taking actions solely because a parent, custodian or guardian is blind.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2113 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1444 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02113 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - signed chap.442