NY S04407 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - SIGNED CHAP.35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the age of consent for purposes of marriage; prohibits marriages of minors under the age of seventeen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the age of consent for purposes of marriage; prohibits marriages of minors under the age of seventeen years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20AssemblySIGNED CHAP.35
2017-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.107
2017-06-08Assemblysubstituted for a5524b
2017-06-06Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-06-06AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-06SenateREPASSED SENATE
2017-05-22SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4407B
2017-05-22SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-22Senatereturned to senate
2017-05-22AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2017-03-07Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2017-03-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-03-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.404
2017-03-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 4407A
2017-03-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2017-02-14SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05524 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - substituted by s4407b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04407&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04407&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04407
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04407&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04407A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04407&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04407B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4407#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4407#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4407#SF2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04407&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback