NY A05524 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-7)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - substituted by s4407b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the age of consent for purposes of marriage; prohibits marriages of minors under the age of seventeen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the age of consent for purposes of marriage; prohibits marriages of minors under the age of seventeen years of age.

Sponsors

Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Mark Gjonaj [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Alfred Graf [R]
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Peter Lawrence [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Matthew Titone [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Frank Skartados [D]Asm. Shelley Mayer [D]Asm. Addie Jenne [D]Asm. Luis Sepulveda [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Francisco Moya [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Pamela Harris [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Earlene Hooper [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D]
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Dean Murray [R]Asm. James Skoufis [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]
Asm. William Magee [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]

Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08Assemblysubstituted by s4407b
2017-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.107
2017-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.107
2017-06-07Assemblyreported
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-23Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-05-17Assemblyprint number 5524b
2017-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2017-02-28Assemblyprint number 5524a
2017-02-28Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2017-02-10Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04407 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SIGNED CHAP.35

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05524&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05524&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05524
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05524&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05524A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05524&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05524B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05524&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05524&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05524&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback