NY S04367 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4367A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4367A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the exemption from sales and use taxes for food and drink sold through any vending machine; increases the exemption to two dollars fifty cents until December 31, 2023.
Title
Relates to increasing the exemption from sales and use taxes for food and drink sold through any vending machine; increases the exemption to two dollars fifty cents until December 31, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4367A |
2020-02-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A06137 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - print number 6137a