NY A06137 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 6137a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 6137a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the exemption from sales and use taxes for food and drink sold through any vending machine; increases the exemption to two dollars fifty cents until December 31, 2023.
Title
Relates to increasing the exemption from sales and use taxes for food and drink sold through any vending machine; increases the exemption to two dollars fifty cents until December 31, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Assembly | print number 6137a |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04367 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4367A