NY S04356 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain insurance companies to provide the superintendent of financial services mental health and substance use disorder parity reports; repeals provisions of the insurance law in relation thereto.
Title
Requires certain insurance companies to provide the superintendent of financial services mental health and substance use disorder parity reports; repeals provisions of the insurance law in relation thereto.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.207 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.206 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | substituted for a6186a |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.257 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06186 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.207