NY A06186 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mental health and substance use disorder parity reporting; repeals provisions in relation thereto.
Title
Relates to mental health and substance use disorder parity reporting; repeals provisions in relation thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.207 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-01 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-01 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.206 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | substituted for a6186a |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.257 |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | substituted by s4356 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.206 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | print number 6186a |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04356 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.207