NY S04354 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing alcoholic beverages on credit to an individual person where the order on credit is at least $200.
Title
Relates to providing alcoholic beverages on credit to an individual person where the order on credit is at least $200.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02993 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to economic development