NY S04186 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2011 to November 30, 2013, the authorization granted to the county of Steuben to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2011 to November 30, 2013, the authorization granted to the county of Steuben to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6585 |
2011-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.484 |
2011-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06585 (Same As) 2011-07-15 - signed chap.132