NY S04150 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Shepherd Patterson law"; requires a physician who treats a minor patient with a medical condition that may cause a disability to provide certain educational information to such patient's parents or guardians indicating such minor is entitled to a free and appropriate public education as defined under section five hundred four of the federal rehabilitation act of nineteen hundred seventy-three; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "Shepherd Patterson law"; requires a physician who treats a minor patient with a medical condition that may cause a disability to provide certain educational information to such patient's parents or guardians indicating such minor is entitled to a free and appropriate public education as defined under section five hundred four of the federal rehabilitation act of nineteen hundred seventy-three; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 4150C |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4150D |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.889 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4150C |
2022-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1536 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4150B |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4150A |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |