NY S04150 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health insurance policies to include mammography screening by breast tomosynthesis.
Title
Requires certain health insurance policies to include mammography screening by breast tomosynthesis.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5677 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1755 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05677 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - approval memo.19