NY S04142 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing signatures, records and contracts secured through blockchain technology to be considered in an electronic form and to be an electronic record and signature; allows smart contracts to exist in commerce.
Title
Relates to allowing signatures, records and contracts secured through blockchain technology to be considered in an electronic form and to be an electronic record and signature; allows smart contracts to exist in commerce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.413 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.278 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A01683 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations