NY S04136 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to direct marketing activities for New York beverages; and authorizes the sale of beer and wine at movie theaters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to direct marketing activities for New York beverages; and authorizes the sale of beer and wine at movie theaters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05Assemblyreferred to economic development
2021-03-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.419
2021-02-02SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A02452 (Same As) 2021-01-19 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback