NY S04112 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the superintendent of financial services to authorize the return of subscribing member operating reserve balances to members of a municipal insurance reciprocal.
Title
Authorizes the superintendent of financial services to authorize the return of subscribing member operating reserve balances to members of a municipal insurance reciprocal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-01 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.53 |
2021-12-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.649 |
2021-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.87 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a3466 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.740 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03466 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - substituted by s4112