NY A03466 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s4112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - substituted by s4112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the superintendent of financial services to authorize the return of subscribing member operating reserve balances to members of a municipal insurance reciprocal.
Title
Authorizes the superintendent of financial services to authorize the return of subscribing member operating reserve balances to members of a municipal insurance reciprocal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s4112 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.87 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04112 (Same As) 2021-12-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.53