NY S04071 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A96A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A96A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates human organ delivery vehicles as authorized emergency vehicles which shall permit the operator of such vehicles certain privileges when involved in an emergency operation.
Title
Designates human organ delivery vehicles as authorized emergency vehicles which shall permit the operator of such vehicles certain privileges when involved in an emergency operation.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A96A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED 4071A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1236 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00096 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - signed chap.496