NY S04059 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires websites providing sex offender registry information to be searchable by the zip code of a registrant's employment.
Title
Requires websites providing sex offender registry information to be searchable by the zip code of a registrant's employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1060 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1547 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06581 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction