NY S04040 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of service contracts to include contracts made by a supplier or seller of a service for repair of cracks or chips in a motor vehicle windshield and for repair or removal of dents, dings or creases from a motor vehicle without affecting the existing paint finish.
Title
Expands definition of service contracts to include contracts made by a supplier or seller of a service for repair of cracks or chips in a motor vehicle windshield and for repair or removal of dents, dings or creases from a motor vehicle without affecting the existing paint finish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.409 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.626 |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a3782a |
2012-03-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2012-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.280 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2011-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4040A |
2011-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.241 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03782 (Same As) 2012-05-30 - substituted by s4040a