NY S04034 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits employees of authorized organizations to operate games of chance.
Title
Permits employees of authorized organizations to operate games of chance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2020-01-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.49 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.377 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A00635 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to racing and wagering