NY S04002 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3002
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3002
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3002 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.587 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03002 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - signed chap.52
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S4002 |